Fedd v. Odum
Plaintiff: Levi Arthur Fedd
Defendant: Roy Odum
Case Number: 5:2023cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 02/01/2023. (jlh) Modified on 2/1/2023 (jlh).
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. The Court also DENIES as moot Plaintiffs requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/31/23. (wwp)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Levi Arthur Fedd. Responses due by 2/1/2023. (ca)
January 18, 2023 Filing 9 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Levi Arthur Fedd.(ca)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to the case. (maa)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Order re Magistrate Assignment. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officerfor possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 1/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Statement Regarding Assignment)(thb)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 Inmate Account Statement by Levi Arthur Fedd. (gmh)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court directs the Plaintiff to submit his application and complaint or petition on the provided forms within 14 days of this Order. PLRA due by 1/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 01/04/2023. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form, #2 2241 Petition Form, and #3 Entered in Error.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2023: #4 IFP Short Form) (jlh). Modified on 1/4/2023 (jlh).
January 4, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2023. (jlh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Roy Odum. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 1/17/2023.. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (pts)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Levi Arthur Fedd. Responses due by 1/17/2023. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(pts)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roy Odum, filed by Levi Arthur Fedd.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedd v. Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Arthur Fedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?