Anonymously v. Ervin et al
Plaintiff: Anonymously and Harrington Campbell
Defendant: Sean Ervin, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Department of Justice and Warden Brenton
Case Number: 5:2023cv00040
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Filing 18 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement on 6/20/23. (wwp)
July 14, 2023 Filing 17 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Sean Ervin on 6/16/23. (wwp)
July 14, 2023 Filing 16 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Executive Office of Immigration Review on 6/21/23. (wwp)
July 13, 2023 Filing 14 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Alejandro Mayorkas on 6/20/23. (wwp)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to U.S. Department of Justice on 6/22/23, USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed by E. Sase on 6/22/23. (wwp)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Petitioner to file a response to Respondents' #11 MOTION to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/6/2023. (ca)
July 6, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/20/2023. (ca)
July 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Brenton, Department of Justice, Sean Ervin, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Merrick Garland, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Alejandro Mayorkas. Responses due by 7/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Valdes Declaration)(Leithart, Otto)
July 5, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Dismiss. (csr)
July 3, 2023 Filing 10 U.S. Marshal Return Executed Merrick Garland Attorney General on 6/22/23. USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed by E. Sase on 6/22/23. (wwp)
June 26, 2023 Filing 9 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to U.S. Attorney for the SDGA and Warden Brenton and on 06/16/2023 and 06/14/2023, respectively; USMS Service Remark: Return Receipt for U.S. Attorney for the SDGA signed by John Stephens on 06/16/2023 and Return Receipt for Warden Brenton signed by Alba Ramos on 06/14/2023. (jlh) Modified on 6/26/2023 (jlh).
June 26, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brenton answer due 7/5/2023. (jlh)
June 26, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Merrick Garland answer due 7/7/2023. (jlh)
June 23, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to grant a Temporary Restraining Order during the (Court's Order) of Twenty-one days by Harrington Campbell. Responses due by 7/7/2023. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Petitioner's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court directs the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the Petition, doc. #4 , and a copy of this Order by registered or certified mail upon: (1) the Attorney General of the United States; (2) the named Respondents; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the SDGA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/8/2023. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2023: #1 Prepared 285 forms) (ca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2023: #2 Prepared 285 form for Sean Ervin) (ca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2023: #3 Correct 285 forms) (ca).
June 8, 2023 Set Deadlines: Compliance re #7 Order due by 6/11/2023. (ca)
June 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harrington Campbell. Responses due by 6/20/2023. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Permanent Injunction, and Request for an Emergency Hearing Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 65(b), With MOTION to Expedite Due to Removal Initiating May 23, 2023, by Harrington Campbell. Responses due by 6/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Envelope.) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh)
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Harrington Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gmh)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anonymously (Harrington Campbell). (jlh)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to return all submitted materials to Petitioner, along with a copy of this Order. Petitioner may then consider whether he wishes to pursue this matter in the ordinary course (i.e., as a publicly accessible action). Local R. 79.7(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/19/2023. (gmh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal. Responses due by 5/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Matter)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anonymously v. Ervin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anonymously
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrington Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Ervin
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office of Immigration Review
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brenton
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?