Eli Lilly and Company v. Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Defendant: Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv00087
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Waycross Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Defendant's second Consent Motion for Extension. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before December 13, 2023. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to extend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on November 9, 2023. (edd)
November 9, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC answer due 12/13/2023. (thb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (thb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Johnson, Mark)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #9 Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Consent Preliminary Injunction Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Lilly is not required to post a bond in any amount in connection with this Consent Preliminary Injunction Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/30/23. (loh)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that this case be reassigned to the undersigned for further plenary disposition. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/16/23. (loh)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before November 12, 2023. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to extend this deadline upon the record and docket of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on October 16, 2023. (edd)
October 16, 2023 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
October 13, 2023 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Consent Preliminary Injunction Order and Memorandum in Support by Eli Lilly and Company. Responses due by 10/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Preliminary Injunction Order)(Spalding, Charles)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC. Responses due by 10/24/2023. (Johnson, Mark)
October 10, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (thb)
October 4, 2023 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Eli Lilly and Company. (Spalding, Charles)
October 2, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC answer due 10/14/2023. (thb)
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Disclosure Statement, Letter dated September 19, 2023, Rule 26 Instruction Order, Trademark Form, Exhibit A, Exhibit B served on Daren Wooten as Registered Agent of Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC on September 23, 2023, filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Spalding, Charles)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/20/2023. (gmh)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC. (gmh)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE re Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark form by Eli Lilly and Company. (gmh)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company. (gmh)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC, filed by Eli Lilly and Company. Filing Fee paid, $402.00, Receipt # AGASDC-3665390. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli Lilly and Company v. Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Charles Gowen Spalding, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Weight Loss & Aesthetics, LLC
Represented By: Mark David Johnson
Represented By: Amber Montrose Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?