Gaskin v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Bud Gaskin
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 6:2011cv00028
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion to clarify the Order and Judgment awarding attorney's fees. It is Ordered that Plaintiff is awarded $5,362.50 in attorney's fees, $454.10 in expenses, and $805.00 in costs under the EAJA. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/3/14. (wwp)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 2/5/14. (bcw)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 7/20/2012. (loh)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Bud Gaskin. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/24/2012. (loh)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER stating that counsel for the parties will submit briefs in accordance with the additional requirements set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/28/2011. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaskin v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Gaskin
Represented By: Eric R. Gotwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?