Sewell v. Chatman et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Sewell
Defendant: Bruce Chatman, Windell Fowler, Larry Brewton, John Paul, Freddie Davis and Ga Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 6:2014cv00067
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 66 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, this case is dismissed without prejudice and this case stands closed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/20/15. (cmr)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER directing service of 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 1 Complaint filed by Jeffery Sewell, and 46 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Objection due 4/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/14/2015. (csr)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 12/18/2014. (loh)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING re 10 Report and Recommendations dismissing Georgia Department of Corrections as a named defendant in this case. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 11/5/2014. (loh)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 16 Motion to transfer to another facility. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 11/3/14. (wwp)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendants Chatman, Paul, Fowler, Brewton, and Davis. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/24/2014. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sewell v. Chatman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windell Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Brewton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ga Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?