Simmons v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Simmons
Defendant: Stanley Williams, James Deal, Wayne Johnson, Eric Smokes, Johnny Davis, Ronnie Bynum, Curtis Whitfield, Antonio Abalos, Johnathan Santiago, Zechariah Jones, Griffin and Andrew Mcfarlane
Case Number: 6:2014cv00111
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2018 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 106 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING 103 Motion to Dismiss, DISMISSING without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint for his failure to comply with discovery, failure to prosecute, and failure to follow this Court's Orders, DENYING Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, and CLOSING this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/27/2018. (maa)
March 9, 2018 106 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendants' 103 MOTION to Dismiss, and DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's claims for his failure to comply with his discovery obligations, failure to follow the C ourt's directives, and failure to prosecute. It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court DIRECT the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case and DENY Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. The Court ORDERS a ny party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2018). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/9/2018. (ca)
March 6, 2018 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 101 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 100 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/06/2018. (maa)
January 12, 2018 101 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY the portion of Defendants' 100 MOTION seeking the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. For the reasons and in the manner set forth below, the Court GRANTS Defendant� 39;s Motion to Compel and GRANTS IN PART Defendant's Motion to Extend the Discovery Period. The Court ORDERS that the current discovery and dispositive motion deadlines are each extended by fourteen (14) days. Any party seeking to object to th is Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2018). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/12/2018. (csr)
September 20, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Overruling 94 Objections, denying 73 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, denying 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Granted in Part and Denied in Part 41 Motion to Dismiss, denying [7 2] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, denying 46 Motion for Default Judgment, denying 71 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, denying 83 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Antonio Simmons. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/20/17. (wwp)
August 9, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY Plaintiff's 71 , 72 , 73 and 75 MOTIONS for Judgment as a Matter of Law; GRANT in part and DENY in part Defendants' 41 MOTION to Dismiss; DENY Plaintiff's 46 MOTION for Default Judgment and 83 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/9/2017. (ca)
October 16, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff file any response in opposition to the Defendants' 41 MOTION to Dismiss or to inform the court of his decision hot to oppose within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is hereby instructed to attach a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/16/2015. (ca)
July 17, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's 9 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; dismissing Plaintiff's official capacity claims against all Defendants, sexual abuse claims, stand-alone verbal threats claims, substantive du e process claims, and deprivation of property claims, as well as his monetary damages claims pursuant to the RLUIPA, 42 U.S.C. § 2000cc-1, et seq., against Defendants Curtis Whitfield, Johnathan Santiago, Antonio Abalos, and FNU Griffin; denying plaintiff's request for issuance of a preliminary injunction; and ruling that Plaintiff's claims remain pending against the following Defendants: Bynum (procedural due process and retaliation); Whitfield, Abalos, and Santiago (excessive fo rce, deliberate indifference, retaliation, religion claims, and Fourth Amendment); Williams, Deal, McFarlane, and Smokes (excessive force, deliberate indifference); Griffin (deliberate indifference and religion claims); Davis (retaliation and religio n claims); Jones (retaliation); and Johnson (excessive force and retaliation). The parties are reminded to follow the directives set forth in the Magistrate Judge's {9] Order dated April 29, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/17/2015. (jah)
June 1, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 9 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, the official capacity claims against defendants Curtis Whitfield, Johnathan Santiago, Antonio Abalos, and FNU Griffin are dismissed. Plaintiff's request for the issuance of a preliminary injunction is denied at this time. The remaining claims will move forward and the parties are reminded to follow the directives set forth in the Magistrate's Order dated April 29, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/1/15. (cmr)
April 29, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants Bynum, Whitfield, Abalos, Santiago, Williams, Davis, Deal, Jones, McFarlane, Smokes, Griffin, and Johnson. Generally, a defendant who timely returns the waiver is not required to answer the complaint until sixty days after the date that the marshal sent the request for waiver. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/29/2015. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Smokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Bynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Abalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zechariah Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mcfarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?