Watson v. Toole et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Watson
Defendant: Robert Toole, John Paul, Windell Fowler, Milton Smith, Janet Brewton, Madia West, Miss Magaha and Marlene Parker
Case Number: 6:2014cv00116
Filed: November 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 22 Report and Recommendations; dismissing this case without prejudice; and closing this civil action. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/21/2015. (thb)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that Defendant's 15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED, that this action be DISMISSED, without prejudice, and that the Clerk be directed to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case. I further recommend that the Court DENY Plaintiff's leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ORDERED to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. ORDER directing the service of the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2015). Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/15/2015. (ca)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendants' 14 Motion to Stay all proceedings, including discovery pending a ruling by the Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to change the name of Defendant Miss Magaha to Delaine Magaha upon th e docket and record of this case. Plaintiff is ordered to file any response in opposition to the Defendants' motion for dismissal or to inform of his decision not to oppose within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/12/2015. (ca)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting 9 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants "GSP Administration", Milton Smith, Robert Toole, John Paul, and Windell Fowler are dismissed. Plaintiff's request for declaratory relief and injunctive relief are denied. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/14/15. (cmr)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants "GSP Administration," Milton Smith, Robert Toole, John Paul, and Windell Fowler be dismissed and that Plaintiff's request for declaratory relief and injunctive relief be denied re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/26/2015. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Toole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windell Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Brewton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madia West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Magaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?