Floyd v. Williams
Plaintiff: Eddie Frank Floyd, III
Defendant: Doug Williams
Case Number: 6:2015cv00103
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER adopting 50 Report and Recommendations, denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing as moot all other pending motions, and denying Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter an appropriate Judgment of Dismissal and to close this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/07/2017. (thb)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendant's 36 First MOTION for Summary Judgment, DENY Plaintiff's 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, DISMISS Plaintiff's 1 Complaint, DISMISS AS MOOT all o ther pending Motions, and DIRECT the Clerk to CLOSE this case. In addition, the Court should DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/29/2016. (ca)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's Objections; adopting 31 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; and denying Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/22/2016. (jah)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 25 Motion to Amend Complaint and denying 26 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/26/2016. (csr)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting the 11 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; overruling Plaintiff's 15 Objections; dismissing Plaintiff's claims for monetary relief against Defendant in his official capacity; dis missing all claims for monetary relief under the Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act; dismissing all claims for compensatory and punitive damages under 42 U.S.C. 1983; additionally, denying Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction; and determining that Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief and nominal damages under Section 1983 shall proceed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/8/2016. (jah)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims for monetary relief against Defendant in his official capacity, DISMISS all claims for monetary relief under the RLUIPA, and DISMISS all claims for comp ensatory and punitive damages under Section 1983 re: 1 Complaint filed by Eddie Frank Floyd, III. Additionally, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction. Any party seeking to object to this Repo rt and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/12/2016. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Frank Floyd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?