Lorenzo v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Ramiro Gonzales Lorenzo, Jr. and Maribel Lorenzo Molina
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections, Stanley Williams, Jarrod D. Pittman, John Doe #1 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 6:2016cv00011
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Discovery. The parties may elect to take the depositions of inmates Richard Duron, Eduardo Nava, and Luis Hernandez-Moreno by working with the wardens. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/8/17. (wwp)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss; instructing the Clerk to terminate the Georgia Department of Corrections and John Doe #1 and John Doe #2 as parties in this case; and determining that only Plaintiffs' claim against Williams and Pittman in their individual capacities for their alleged Failure to protect Lorenzo, which Defendants did not move to dismiss, will proceed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/8/2017. (jah)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay discovery pending the resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/22/16. (wwp) Modified on 3/22/2016 (wwp).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorenzo v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Gonzales Lorenzo, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Nash, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Lorenzo Molina
Represented By: Thomas A. Nash, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Ronald J. Stay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Williams
Represented By: Ronald J. Stay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod D. Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?