Timmons v. Reid et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Timmons
Defendant: Reid, Sanders and Homer Bryson
Case Number: 6:2016cv00058
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting 30 Report and Recommendations; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing Plaintiff's complaint without prejudice for failure to exhaust his administrative remedies, and denying Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to close this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/06/2017. (thb)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss and DISMISS without prejudice Plaintiff's 1 Complaint for his failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. It is also RECOMME NDED that the Court DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and DENY Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/20/2017. (csr)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendants' 16 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings, including discovery are stayed pending a ruling by the Court on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, at which time a discovery schedule will be entered as to any claims that may remain. This ruling does not affect Plaintiff's obligation to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/15/2016. (csr)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed against Defendants in their official capacities and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Homer Bryson in their entirety. Claims against Defendants Reid and Sanders remain pending. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/26/16. (cmr)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/23/2016. (ca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timmons v. Reid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?