Gaines v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Juanice Gaines
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 6:2017cv00006
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 5 Motion to Dismiss, 8 Motion to Amend/Correct, and 7 Report and Recommendations. COA is denied in this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 5/22/17. (slt)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Juanice Gaines Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/13/17. (trb)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve the United States Attorney with this Order and a copy of the petition. ( Compliance due by 2/9/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/10/17. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juanice Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: James Christian Stuchell
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?