Johnson v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Renardo Johnson, Jr.
Defendant: Sandy Jackson, Thevonza Bobbit, Sharp, Wise and Anthony
Case Number: 6:2017cv00080
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Appling
Referring Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended CLERK'S JUDGMENT adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation dismissing the case without prejudice. (wwp)
November 8, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Court DENIES Plaintiff leave to proceed informa pauperis on appeal. The Clerk of Court is hereby authorized and directed to enter an appropriate Judgment of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/08/17. (jlm)
October 2, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS this action, without prejudice, and DIRECT the Clerk to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal and to CLOSE this case re 1 Complaint, 6 Amended Complaint. It is furt her recommended that the Court DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ORDERED to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/2/2017. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Renardo Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thevonza Bobbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?