Lane v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Steve Lane
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Agriculture and Sonny Perdue
Case Number: 6:2017cv00082
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Emanuel
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/7/2019. (pts)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of and against both Plaintiff Steve Lane and Defendants United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, and Sonny Perdue. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 09/07/2018. (jlh)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties' 9 Motion for Summary Judgment and 15 Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court vacates and affirms certain portions of the ALJ's decision. The Court remands this case back to t he ALJ for purposes of determining the appropriate sanctions in light of this Court's ruling. This Court's injunction pursuant to 5 USC § 705 shall remain in place until the ALJ determines the appropriate sanctions on remand. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/06/2018. (jlh)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The USDA shall stay its enforcement of Plaintiff's debarment pending the conclusion of this Court's judicial review. Plaintiff shall inform any potential lenders that his crop insurance is subject to rescission upon an adverse judgment by this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 2/27/2018. (pts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Lane
Represented By: George H. Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Xavier Aloysius Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?