Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Powell et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Bernice Powell, Betty Hodges Powell, Metlife Home Loans and The United States
Case Number: 6:2017cv00084
Filed: June 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate all motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/4/20. (jrb) Modified on 2/4/2020 (jrb).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER directing the Plaintiffs to file a Second Amended Complaint, which names Dianne Powell Morris as a Defendant and includes allegations against her, within SEVEN (7) DAYS of the entry of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants the Unknown Heirs of Bernice Powell and the Unknown Heirs of Betty Hodges Powell within SEVEN (7) DAYS of the entry of this Order. The Court also ORDERS Plaintiffs to tender the outstanding publication co sts to the Clerk of Court within SEVEN (7) DAYS of the entry of this Order. The Court finds the United States and MetLife have not been properly served (due to deficiencies in the manner and method of service and untimeliness of service, respectiv ely) and therefore REOPENS and EXTENDS the time for service on the United States and on MetLife for a period of THIRTY (30) DAYS following the filing of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to WITHDRAW the Entries of Default as to the United States and MetLife. (Compliance due by 5/7/2019) Amended Complaint due by 5/7/2019.) Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/30/19. (jrb)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the plaintiff to deposit the cost of publication with the Clerk within seven days from the date of this order re 20 Order on Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/5/18. (jrb) Modified on 3/5/2018 (jrb).
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the plaintiffs to either present proof of service on defendants Metlife Home Loans and the United States or show cause for their failure to timely serve those parties (Compliance due by 1/4/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/20/17. (jrb) Modified on 12/21/2017 (jrb).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Paul G. Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Hodges Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?