Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Case Number: 6:2017cv00100
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER and Notice of Pretrial Proceedings, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2019 10:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall., Jury Selection set for 11/18/2019 09:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom and Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 09:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall.) Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/9/2019. (pts)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER and NOTICE of Pretrial Proceedings. The Court orders lead counsel to meet and confer in person and prepare and file with the Clerk one consolidated proposed pretrial order. Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2019. All unresolved evidentiary objections and motions in limine due by 4/18/2019. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 5/16/2019 11:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall and Jury Selection is scheduled for 5/20/2019 09:00 AM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/8/2019. (pts)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/26/18. (cmr)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's motion is denied as to the disability discrimination claim and granted as to retaliation claim. This case will proceed to trial in due course. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/29/2018. (pts)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 34 Motion ; granting 42 Motion to Continue; granting 43 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/11/18. (wwp)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Stay and extension of all deadlines. The Court grants the EEOC's request for an extension of defendants expert witness reports deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/25/18. (wwp)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Terri T. Mosley. The Clerk is directed to file Terri T. Mosley's Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/12/17. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: James W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?