Davis v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Glynn N. Davis
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 6:2017cv00101
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/14/18. (wwp)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to refer the parties to mediation ; granting 17 Motion to Stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/15/18. (wwp)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING re 5 Order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/14/17. (jrb)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that within 14 days of service of this Order, Plaintiff shall show cause why the case should not be dismissed. (Compliance due by 9/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/24/17. (wwp) Modified on 8/24/2017 (wwp).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynn N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?