The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Bacon et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Nicholas S. Bacon and Eric C. Smith
Case Number: 6:2017cv00134
Filed: October 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Tattnall
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Entry of Judgment, directing the Clerk of Court to enter Judgement in favor of Defendant Eric C. Smith in the amount of $113,390.30, directing the Clerk of Court to disburse to Eric C. Smith the amount of $113,390.30 plus any accrued interest from the Registry. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending deadlines or motions and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/18/2019. (thb)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Deupty Clerk on 06/11/2018. Signed by Unassigned Judge on 06/11/2018. (evs)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Prudential's request for interpleader (doc. 1); granting 9 Motion for Entry of Default as to Nicholas S. Bacon; granting 10 Joint Motion to Deposit Funds; granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; and denying Prudential's request for attorneys' fees (doc. 1). The Court Orders the Clerk of Court to: (1) Enter Default against Defendant Bacon; (2) Receive into the Registry of this Court payment by Prudential of the Death Benefit in the amount of $100,000 plus applica ble interest; (3) and Dismiss Prudential from this case. Furthermore, it Orders Defendants to enter pleadings establishing their adversity to one another and stating their claims to the Death Benefit within 21 days of the entry of this Order. Defendants shall serve their pleadings on one another in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/25/2018. (thb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Bacon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Nikole M. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas S. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric C. Smith
Represented By: C. Dorian Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?