Williams v. Deal

Petitioner: Grady Renard Williams, Jr.
Respondent: Nathan Deal
Case Number: 6:2018cv00090
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
2 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge recommending DENIAL of re #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Grady Renard Williams, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/19/2018. (evs)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing the #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Grady Renard Williams, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/12/18. (wwp)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. No ID number. Populated ID in profile and mailed #2 Notice with blank IFP form to Grady Williams, JCC, 3404 Kent Farm Dr, Millen, GA 30442. (wwp) Modified on 9/14/2018 (wwp).
August 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/21/2018. (wwp)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing fee deficiency re #1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. (wwp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Grady Renard Williams, Jr. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathan Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grady Renard Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?