Rountree v. Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Plaintiff: George H. Rountree
Defendant: Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00008
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials as to Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company re 13 Certificate of Service. (evk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2019. Discovery due by 7/18/2019. Motions due by 8/19/2019. Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 4/29/2019. Witness Report (defendant) due by 5/29/2019. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 03/18/2019. (evk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company. (Ray, Dale)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George H. Rountree re #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aaron, Charles) Modified on 3/8/2019 (evk).
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aaron, Charles)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company. (Major, Gene)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George H. Rountree re #6 Notice of Appearance (Aaron, Charles)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Patrick Aaron on behalf of George H. Rountree (Aaron, Charles)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George H. Rountree re #4 Notice of Appearance (Rountree, George)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by George H. Rountree on behalf of George H. Rountree (Rountree, George)
February 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/18/2019. Motions due by 2/22/2019. (evk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (evk)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/08/2019. (evk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (evk).
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company from Superior Court of Bulloch County, case number SUCV2018000340. ( Filing fee paid on 02/08/2019 - $400.00; receipt number 113J-2537234)(Major, Gene) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, #4 Exhibit C - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, #5 Exhibit D - CERTIFICATION UNDER RULE 3.2, #6 Exhibit E - CASE INFORMATION FORM, #7 Exhibit F - ANSWER OF ENCOMPASS, #8 Exhibit G - CERTIFICATE PURSUANT TO UNIFORM SUPERIOR COURT RULE 5.2, #9 Exhibit H - AFFIDAVIT OF JONATHAN RITTLE)(evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rountree v. Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Gene A. Major
Represented By: Dale C. Ray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H. Rountree
Represented By: Charles Patrick Aaron
Represented By: George H. Rountree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?