Rich v. Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Debra C. Rich
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Cathy Coleman
Case Number: 6:2019cv00028
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company. Cathy Coleman served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cathy Coleman. (evk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Pohlmann, Aaron)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company. (Pohlmann, Aaron)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Cathy Coleman, COUNTERCLAIM against Debra C. Rich by Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Change of Ownership, #3 Exhibit C - Request to Withdraw Funds, #4 Exhibit D - Change of Beneficiary, #5 Exhibit E - Death Certificate)(Pohlmann, Aaron)
April 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance, Motion for Pro Hac Vice, or Notice of Compliance due by 4/27/2019. Pending State Motions due by 5/1/2019. (jrb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. (jrb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company from Superior Court of Emanuel County, case number 19CV00064. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 113J-2584484), filed by Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 State Complaint, #3 State Summons, #4 State Information Sheet, #5 Sheriff's Entry of Service, #6 Notice to State Court of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Colonial Life & Accidental Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Aaron E. Pohlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra C. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cathy Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?