Environmental Wood Products, Inc v. Hall & Navarro, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Environmental Wood Products, Inc
Defendant: Hall & Navarro, LLC and Renasant Bank
Case Number: 6:2019cv00057
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/13/19. (jrb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Turner, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Environmental Wood Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jt Motion to ReOpen Bkrcy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Resp to Jt Motion to ReOpen)(Turner, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Renasant Bank. (Brown, Rickie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Renasant Bank identifying Renasant Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Brown, Rickie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Hall & Navarro, LLC. (Sprinkle, Shannon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Renasant Bank. (Brown, Rickie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Environmental Wood Products, Inc. Responses due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal of H&N Claims, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal of Renasant Bank, #3 Exhibit 3 - Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 4 - REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, #5 Exhibit 5 - H&N Email 7-25-19, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plf Email 7-25-19, #7 Exhibit 7 - H&N 2nd Email 7-25-19)(Mikell, Samuel)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, and #7 Consent MOTION to Stay. The parties are directed to inform the Court whether any of the entities are subject to bankruptcy proceedings (Compliance due by 8/12/2019.) The parties are further directed to amend their Rule 26(f) Report if the case is not subject to an automatic stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/29/2019. (pts)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mikell, Samuel)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/22/19. (sff)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2646561, Fee Amount $200, by Hall & Navarro, LLC. Responses due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 List of Cases, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kingma, Johannes)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Environmental Wood Products, Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2019. (Mikell, Samuel)
July 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION to Stay. (wwp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Stay by Environmental Wood Products, Inc. Responses due by 7/24/2019. (Turner, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Drew DeMott on behalf of Renasant Bank (DeMott, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel LeCraw Mikell on behalf of Environmental Wood Products, Inc (Mikell, Samuel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bartley Turner on behalf of Environmental Wood Products, Inc (Turner, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (trb)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/20/19. (trb)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance, Motion for Pro Hac Vice, or Notice of Compliance due by 6/30/2019. Motions due by 7/4/2019. (trb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. (trb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Renasant Bank from Superior Court of Tattnall County, case number SUV2019000089. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2626052), filed by Renasant Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Superior Court Filings)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Environmental Wood Products, Inc v. Hall & Navarro, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall & Navarro, LLC
Represented By: Shannon M. Sprinkle
Represented By: Johannes S. Kingma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renasant Bank
Represented By: Rickie Lee Brown, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Garland
Represented By: Matthew Drew DeMott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Wood Products, Inc
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Represented By: Samuel LeCraw Mikell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?