Standard Insurance Company v. Riley et al
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: Yathomas Lee Riley, Joseph Amodio and Eileen Amodio
Case Number: 6:2019cv00084
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Yathomas Lee Riley. Responses due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Ronald J. Freeman, Sr.)(Hart, Bettieanne)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Eileen Amodio, Joseph Amodio. (Muller, Peter)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Eileen Amodio, Joseph Amodio. (Muller, Peter)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Eileen Amodio, Joseph Amodio.(Muller, Peter)
October 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Eileen Amodio answer due 11/4/2019; Joseph Amodio answer due 11/4/2019. (jrb)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/21/19. (jrb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Answer by Eileen Amodio, Joseph Amodio. Responses due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Order on Consent Extension to Answer)(Muller, Peter)
October 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Yathomas Lee Riley answer due 10/23/2019. (jrb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed of Defendant Yathomas Riley Acknowledgement filed by Standard Insurance Company. (White, Brendan)
October 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Eileen Amodio answer due 10/21/2019; Joseph Amodio answer due 10/21/2019. (jrb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed of Defendant Joseph Amodio Acknowledgement filed by Standard Insurance Company. (White, Brendan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed of Defendant Eileen Amodio Acknowledgement filed by Standard Insurance Company. (White, Brendan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jrb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #1 Correct image) (jrb).
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #1 Correct image) (jrb).
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #1 Correct image) (jrb).
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Standard Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Standard Insurance Company. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/16/19. (loh)
September 16, 2019 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Standard Insurance Company. Receipt # 113J-2684469. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Insurance Company v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yathomas Lee Riley
Represented By: Bettieanne C. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Amodio
Represented By: Peter D. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Amodio
Represented By: Peter D. Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Brendan H. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?