Henderson v. Care Civic of America et al
Plaintiff: Sylvester Leon Henderson
Defendant: Warden Robert Adams, Jr, Care Civic of America, Keith Marler, Rowe and Colonel Holmes
Case Number: 6:2019cv00106
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to all Counsel of Record of Transferal of Action. (jrb)
November 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 . (jrb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04869. Case transferred electronically
November 19, 2019 Case ELECTRONICALLY transferred to District of Southern District of Georgia, Statesboro Division. (jpa)
November 18, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Janet F. King terminated from case. (jpa)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING this action to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA, THE STATESBORO DIVISION, along with all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings, and exhibits (if any) filed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 11/18/19. (jpa)
October 31, 2019 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Affidavit In Support by Sylvester Leon Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sylvester Leon Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Sylvester Henderson, #2 Complaint - Contents, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Plaintiff's Objection, #5 Exhibits - Proposed Superior Court Summon(s), #6 Civil Cover Sheet -1, #7 Civil Cover Sheet -2)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified filer's name on 10/31/2019 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Care Civic of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert Adams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Civic of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Leon Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?