DIXON v. LEWIS et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL M DIXON, III
Defendant: TERESA STONE, Ms. Prince, Captain Kenny Thompson, Lt. Marsh, DUSTIN LANIER, Michael Lewis and MARCUS NESMITH
Case Number: 6:2020cv00016
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Complaint. (loh)
February 12, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SAMUEL M DIXON, III, #7 MOTION for Court to Subpoena Documents from Defendants. (loh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:19-cv-00479. Case transferred electronically
February 12, 2020 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 2/26/2020.) (tam)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 2/11/2020. (chc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Court to Subpoena Documents from Defendants Filed by SAMUEL M DIXON, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Samuel M. Dixon regarding the process to put a request to see internal affairs (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from SAMUEL M. DIXON, III regarding receipt of one copy of Order of Referral - only one copy of the Order of Referral was sent - copy of this NEF mailed to Plaintiff re #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ans)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SAMUEL M DIXON, III (ans)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by SAMUEL M DIXON, III.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by SAMUEL M DIXON, III (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope - all documents filed in this case were mailed in 4 different envelopes with pieces of documents in each envelope)(ans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON v. LEWIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL M DIXON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERESA STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kenny Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSTIN LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCUS NESMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?