Baker v. Bobitt
Plaintiff: Paxvo Ebube Chukwu doing business as Rashond Wesley Baker, Rashond Wesley Baker doing business as Rashond Wesley Baker also known as Paxvo Ebube Chukwu and Paxvo Ebube Chukwu
Defendant: Trevonza Bobitt
Case Number: 6:2020cv00066
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. The Court directs the Clerk to serve Plaintiff's custodian with a copy of the Court's August 19th Order, (doc. no. 8), the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, and this Order. Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order and Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement) (thb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Order, by Rashond Wesley Baker. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve this Order on Plaintiff's custodian and to include a Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement with that service copy. Plaintiff must then return the Trust Fund Account Statement to the Court by no later than September 2, 2020. Compliance due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement) (thb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT by Prisoner Rashond Wesley Baker to collection of fees. (pts)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER extending the deadline for Plaintiff to return both the the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees forms. Plaintiff shall have through and including August 13, 2020, to return the required forms. Compliance due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/30/2020. (thb)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paxvo Ebube Chukwu. (pts)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to compliance with the conditions of this Order. PLRA due by 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 PLRA Forms.) (jlh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Paxvo Ebube Chukwu. (loh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paxvo Ebube Chukwu. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(loh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trevonza Bobitt, filed by Paxvo Ebube Chukwu.(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Bobitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paxvo Ebube Chukwu doing business as Rashond Wesley Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashond Wesley Baker doing business as Rashond Wesley Baker also known as Paxvo Ebube Chukwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paxvo Ebube Chukwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevonza Bobitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?