Monitronics International Inc. v. Myers
Plaintiff: Monitronics International Inc. doing business as Brinks Home Security
Defendant: Jack H. Myers
Counter Defendant: Monitronics International Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00079
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum filed by Monitronics International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - Third Declaration of Verret)(Reagin, Patrick)
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim Under the Lanham Act filed by Jack H. Myers. (Brooks, Eugene)
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Monitronics International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Verret, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Reagin)(Reagin, Patrick)
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim Under the Lanham Act filed by Monitronics International Inc.. (Reagin, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Monitronics International Inc. of Intent to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc 11) (Reagin, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Monitronics International Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (Reagin, Patrick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum filed by Jack H. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jack Myers, #2 Affidavit Joyce Carter, #3 Affidavit Hattie Herman)(Brooks, Eugene)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; GRANTING #17 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Responses due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 09/24/2020. (JH)
September 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss (Docs 14 & 15) . (JH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to Respond to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss (Docs 14 & 15) by Monitronics International Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reagin, Patrick)
September 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum . (JH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum by Jack H. Myers. Responses due by 10/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Eugene)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 ******* MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jack H. Myers. Responses due by 9/24/2020. (Brooks, Eugene)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim Under the Lanham Act by Jack H. Myers. Responses due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under the Lanham Act)(Brooks, Eugene) Modified on 9/11/2020 (JH).
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jack H. Myers. (Brooks, Eugene)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Monitronics International Inc. by Jack H. Myers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brooks, Eugene) Modified on 9/11/2020 (JH).
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum by Monitronics International Inc.. Responses due by 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Reagin, Patrick)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monitronics International Inc.. Jack H. Myers served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Hamrick, John)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/20/2020. (loh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting re #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/20/2020. (loh)
August 20, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Allen Maines Receipt Number AGASDC-2907116, Fee Amount $200, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick B. Reagin Receipt Number AGASDC-2907130, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick B. Reagin Receipt Number AGASDC-2907130, Fee Amount $200, by Monitronics International Inc.. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hamrick, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Allen Maines Receipt Number AGASDC-2907116, Fee Amount $200, by Monitronics International Inc.. Responses due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hamrick, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Monitronics International Inc.. (Hamrick, John)
August 18, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/18/2020. (loh)
August 18, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2905204. (loh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jack H. Myers. (loh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jack H. Myers, filed by Monitronics International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monitronics International Inc. v. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monitronics International Inc. doing business as Brinks Home Security
Represented By: John M. Hamrick
Represented By: J. Allen Maines
Represented By: Patrick B. Reagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack H. Myers
Represented By: Eugene C. Brooks, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Monitronics International Inc.
Represented By: John M. Hamrick
Represented By: J. Allen Maines
Represented By: Patrick B. Reagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?