Cobble v. U.S. Government et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Defendant: Warden Trevonze Bobbit, GDC Commissioner, U.S. Government, Javaca Johnson and Georgia Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 6:2020cv00100
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing by Daniel Eric Cobble. (wwp)
December 4, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service by Daniel Eric Cobble. (loh)
December 3, 2020 Filing 57 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge recommending filing restrictions be imposed upon Plaintiff in all currently pending and future filings in this district. It is further RECOMMENDED that re #1 Complaint be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/03/2020. (JH)
November 23, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to pull filing fee out of my Covid 19 tax refund by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(wwp)
November 20, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel U.S. Government to Replace all My Legal Properties by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Eric Cobble re #51 MOTION to Compel, #52 MOTION to Compel. (jrb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Compel U.S. Government to Give Me and This Court all Federal Records by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Compel both the State of Georgia and U.S. Government Defendants to Feed Me Enough Food by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel U.S. Government to give me the Indigent Grants by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Compel Georgia Department of Corrections Commissioner to Replace all my Legal Properties by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Fed/State Defendants to give me a Voice by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Pro Se Paralegal Fees at Max Amount Legal by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Compel GDC to give me All Linens by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Court to Tell me Which Case Type This is by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to File This Suit Under the Emoluments Clause of the U.S. Constitution by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Court to Acknowledge None of Today's Motions are Seeking Habeas Relief by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for the Court to Refile all of Today's Motions again and again in all five Lawsuits by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Court to Tell Me if Yall got all Five of my Different Lawsuits by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Speedy Civil Jury Trial by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Eric Cobble. Responses due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Signature) REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(MG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE to the Court by Daniel Eric Cobble re #13 Order re Magistrate Assignment. (wwp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Daniel Eric Cobble. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH) Modified on 11/17/2020 (JH).
November 17, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 28 OBJECTION as to #16 Report and Recommendations, by Daniel Eric Cobble. (loh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Compel G.D.C. and U. Government to put me on Immediate and Permanent Protective Custody at all facilities, by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Compel D.D.C., U.S.B.P., U.S Marshal, and U.S Government to abide by my Revocation by the Government by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Court Acknowledgement by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Georgia Department of Corrections/Feds to Clean my cell, by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION Compel by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION For Contempt of Court, by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by Daniel Eric Cobble. (loh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Protect by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Court to Compel DNA by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the U.S. Magistrate Judge recommending DENYING re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Eric Cobble, and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. Objections to R&R due by 11/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/09/2020. (JH)
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to U.S. Government, Georgia Dept. of Corrections, GDC Commissioner, Trevonze Bobbit, Javaca Johnson. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 11/18/2020. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/4/20. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2020: #2 Statement main) (wwp).
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Subpoena by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Daniel Eric Cobble. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Process Service by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Rule by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Admit by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Subpoena by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 Jury Demand by Daniel Eric Cobble. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Restraining Order by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Daniel Eric Cobble. (JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Eric Cobble. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(JH)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble.(JH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble v. U.S. Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Trevonze Bobbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDC Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javaca Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?