Johnson v. Bobbitt et al
Plaintiff: Eric OBrien Johnson
Defendant: Ochipinti, Trevonza Bobbitt, Wanada Sharp, Jones and Chovaka Johnson
Case Number: 6:2021cv00022
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the date of this order to show cause why the case should not be dismissed under Rule 11 as a sanction for providing false information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/5/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (wwp)
May 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 5/19/2021. (wwp)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION and Memorandum of Law in Support for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, by Eric OBrien Johnson. (jlh)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trevonza Bobbitt, Chovaka Johnson, Wanada Sharp, filed by Eric OBrien Johnson.(wwp)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Eric Obrien Johnson; directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within fourteen days. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/13/2021. (Attachment: #1 Prisoner Complaint Form.) (jlh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 Signature Page re #8 Notice of Deficiency. (maa)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 Order re Magistrate Assignment. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/21/2021. (JH)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric OBrien Johnson. (ca)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Eric OBrien Johnson to collection of fees. (loh)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 4/21/2021. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/22/21. (wwp)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Trevonza Bobbitt, Wanada Sharp, Chovaka Johnson, Ochipinti, Jones. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 4/5/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 03/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement Regarding Assignment of Case to a Magistrate Judge) (maa)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Eric OBrien Johnson. (maa)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric OBrien Johnson. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric OBrien Johnson.(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Bobbitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochipinti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevonza Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanada Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chovaka Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric OBrien Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?