DAKER v. EMMONS
Petitioner: Waseem Daker
Respondent: Warden SHAWN EMMONS and Warden BRIAN ADAMS
Not Classified By Court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Case Number: 6:2021cv00040
Filed: May 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 Motion to dismiss. (wwp)
May 28, 2021 Filing 25 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 7:20-cv-00043. Case transferred electronically
May 28, 2021 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 6/11/2021.) (rlw)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 5/28/2021. (kat)
May 3, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by WASEEM DAKER re #18 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION AS MOOT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
April 29, 2021 REVIEW BY CHAMBERS REQUESTED: Chambers of CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL notified that review is requested Re: #22 Order to Show Cause, #21 Order for Response to Motion. No responses have been filed. (sbd)
April 29, 2021 ***Deadlines terminated for response to motion and to file response to show cause order. (sbd)
April 7, 2021 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #22 Order to Show Cause, #21 Griffith Notice and Order for Response to Motion, I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #22 Order to Show Cause, #21 Griffith Notice Order for Response to Motion,, including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (kat)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Petitioner is ORDERED to show cause, no later than April 28, 2021, why his petition should not be dismissed as moot. Specifically, Petitioner should address whether he remains in Tier II or has been released to general population. No extensions will be granted. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/7/2021. (kat)
April 7, 2021 Filing 21 GRIFFITH NOTICE and ORDER for Response to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION AS MOOT filed by BRIAN ADAMS. Petitioner is therefore ORDERED to file a written response to Respondent's motion to dismiss by April 28, 2021. No extensions will be granted. Thereafter, the Court will consider the motion and any opposition to it filed by Petitioner. If no written response is submitted by Petitioner, the Court will deem the motion to be uncontested. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 4/7/2021. (kat)
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by WASEEM DAKER re #14 Order, Order to Show Cause, Order on Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
April 6, 2021 Motion(s) No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION AS MOOT by BRIAN ADAMS. Motion will be handled by MTT Chambers. (kat)
April 2, 2021 ***Deadlines terminated: Show Cause Response Deadline terminated; Show Cause Response filed at #17 . (vs)
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of filing by BRIAN ADAMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 an affidavit from Respondent regarding Petitioners movement history.)(CROWDER, MATTHEW)
April 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION AS MOOT by BRIAN ADAMS filed by MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION AS MOOT). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(CROWDER, MATTHEW)
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by BRIAN ADAMS re #14 Order,, Order to Show Cause,, Order on Report and Recommendations, (CROWDER, MATTHEW)
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER on behalf of BRIAN ADAMS Attorney MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER added to party BRIAN ADAMS(pty:res)(CROWDER, MATTHEW)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of BRIAN ADAMS Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party BRIAN ADAMS(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA)
March 15, 2021 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #14 Order, Order to Show Cause, Order on Report and Recommendations, I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #14 Order, Order to Show Cause, Order on Report and Recommendations, including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (sbd)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REJECTING #12 Report and Recommendations. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The parties are ORDERED to show cause, no later than April 1, 2021, why this case should not be transferred to the Southern District of Georgia. No extensions will be granted. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 3/15/2021. (kat)
March 8, 2021 ***Report and Recommendation Submitted: #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WASEEM DAKER. (sbd)
March 8, 2021 ***Set/Reset 90 Day Case Review Deadline. (sbd)
February 18, 2021 OBJECTION (signed) to #12 Report and Recommendations filed by WASEEM DAKER. (sbd)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations filed by WASEEM DAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
January 27, 2021 ***Report and Recommendation Submitted: #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WASEEM DAKER. (sbd)
January 5, 2021 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WASEEM DAKER I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WASEEM DAKER including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (sbd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by WASEEM DAKER. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 1/5/2021. (sbd)
December 7, 2020 ***Set/Reset 90 Day Case Review Deadline: (vs)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Response to Magistrate's 9/30/20 Order) against SHAWN EMMONS by WASEEM DAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
October 28, 2020 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc), I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc), including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (rlw)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to supplement petition for writ of habeas corpus. Petitioner shall have an additional THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order to comply with the Court's September 30, 2020 Order #7 . Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 10/28/2020. (rlw)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sbd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #7 Order filed by WASEEM DAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(sbd)
October 26, 2020 ***Deadlines terminated for filing supplemental complaint. (sbd)
October 1, 2020 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (sbd)
September 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines for supplementing complaint. (sbd)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Expedite; denying #6 Motion to Expedite. Petitioner shall have TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date shown on this Order to supplement his Petition. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 9/30/2020. (sbd)
September 8, 2020 ***Set/Reset 90 Day Case Review Deadline. (sbd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Rule and Review and Other Proceedings filed by WASEEM DAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(sbd)
August 7, 2020 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document Case Assigned/Reassigned, #4 Order to Consolidate Case, I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of Case Assigned/Reassigned, #4 Order to Consolidate Case, including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. DOCKET SHEET ENCLOSED. (ggs)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against SHAWN EMMONS by WASEEM DAKER (Attachments: #1 Envelope(Filed pursuant to Order Consolidating case entered 8/5/2020)(ggs)
August 5, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL and US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE. US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON, US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF no longer assigned to the case.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(ggs)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE It is ORDERED that this case, 5:18-cv-171-MTT-CHW, be CONSOLIDATED into Daker II, 7:20-cv-43-HL-TQL, and that case, 5:18-cv-171-MTT-CHW, be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the Amended Petition in case 5:18-cv-171-MTT-CHW (ECF No. 26) as an amended petition in Daker II to ensure that all of Petitioners claims are preserved in the newly consolidated action. The newly consolidated case shall be assigned to Judge Treadwell and referred to Judge Weigle. Lead Case # 7:20-cv-43. Member Case # 5:18-cv-171. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 8/5/2020. (ggs)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Ruling, Review and Other Proceedings filed by WASEEM DAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd)
June 8, 2020 ***Set/Reset 90 Day Case Review Deadline. (sbd)
March 23, 2020 Filing fee Paid: Habeas $5.00, Receipt Number: GAM500035152 (vs)
March 10, 2020 CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (sbd)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by WASEEM DAKER. (sbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2020: #1 Envelope) (sbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAKER v. EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Waseem Daker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden SHAWN EMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden BRIAN ADAMS
Represented By: Matthew B. Crowder
Represented By: Paula K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?