Mincey v. The Green Toad LLC et al
Plaintiff: Johnie Mincey
Defendant: The Green Toad LLC, Got Hemp The Green Toad Farm Dispensary Limited Liability Company and Mr. Reginald L. Reese
Case Number: 6:2021cv00048
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Randal Hall
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnie Mincey. Got Hemp The Green Toad Farm Dispensary Limited Liability Company served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Herman, Charles)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnie Mincey. The Green Toad LLC served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Herman, Charles) Modified on 9/3/2021 (slt).
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnie Mincey. Reginald L. Reese served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Herman, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Johnie Mincey. (Herman, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Johnie Mincey. (Herman, Charles)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/09/2021. (jlh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Got Hemp The Green Toad Farm Dispensary Limited Liability Company, Reginald L. Reese, and The Green Toad LLC. (jlh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Johnie Mincey. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh)
July 9, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record: Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jlh)
July 9, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3142400. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mincey v. The Green Toad LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnie Mincey
Represented By: Charles Seaton Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Toad LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Got Hemp The Green Toad Farm Dispensary Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Reginald L. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?