First Hawaiian Bank v. Office Creativity, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: First Hawaiian Bank
Defendant: Office Creativity, Inc. and Jesse S. Lujan
Case Number: 1:2018cv00033
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
0 Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
1 Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 13 Affidavit re #11 Application for Entry of Default Judgment of Defendants, Jointly and Severally (of Billyscott C. Bernardo) filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit re #11 Application for Entry of Default Judgment of Defendants, Jointly and Severally (of Richard L. Johnson) filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 Application for Entry of Default Judgment of Defendants, Jointly and Severally filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Jesse S. Lujan (fad, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Office Creativity, Inc. (fad, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Declaration re #7 Request for Entry of Default of Jesse S. Lujan filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Entry of Default of Jesse S. Lujan filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Declaration re #5 Request for Entry of Default Office Creativity, Inc. filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Entry of Default Office Creativity, Inc. filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Johnson, Richard)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by First Hawaiian Bank. Jesse S. Lujan served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (fad, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by First Hawaiian Bank. Office Creativity, Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (fad, )
September 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to Jesse S. Lujan. (vtk)
September 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to Office Creativity, Inc. (vtk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number GUX014702.), filed by First Hawaiian Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Cover Sheet) (vtk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Hawaiian Bank v. Office Creativity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Creativity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse S. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Hawaiian Bank
Represented By: Richard L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?