Del Carmen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Norma Del Carmen
Defendant: USA and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00035
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 12/20/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Norma Del Carmen. United States of America served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (fad, )
November 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (fad, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against USA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-450500.), filed by Norma Del Carmen. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 11/6/2018.(Perez, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Carmen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Del Carmen
Represented By: Peter Cornell Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?