Schaller v. U.S. Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: Katrina Schaller
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and U.S. Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00044
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response to Complaint due 3/11/2019. Scheduling Conference continued to 3/27/2019 at 8:30 a.m. Off-island counsel wishing to participate at said hearing via telephone shall file notice of said participation no later than 48 hours prior to the hearing. Furthermore, the parties' Scheduling and Planning Conference Report shall be filed no later than March 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 1/31/2019. (fad, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for 30-Day Extension to File Response to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Schwab, Mikel) **Modified on 1/31/2019 to correct event type to "Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer** (fad, ).
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 3/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 11:15 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Returned Executed filed by Katrina Schaller. Acting Attorney General Matthew Whitaker served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (vtk) **Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct answer due date** (vtk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Returned Executed filed by Katrina Schaller. U.S. Attorney Shawn N. Anderson served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (vtk) **Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct answer due date** (vtk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Katrina Schaller. Nancy A Berryhill served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (vtk) **Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct answer due date** (vtk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Returned Executed filed by Katrina Schaller. U.S. Social Security Administration served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (vtk) **Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct answer due date** (vtk)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Paul Suitter for Katrina Schaller admitted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 12/7/2018. (fad, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Thomas Tobin for Katrina Schaller admitted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 12/7/2018. (fad, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting #3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Susan M. Davies for Katrina Schaller admitted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 12/7/2018. (fad, )
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #2 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Michael F. Williams for Katrina Schaller admitted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 12/7/2018. (fad, )
December 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney (fad, ) **Modified on 12/7/2018 to edit docket text** (fad, ).
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
December 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 1,000.00, receipt number GUX014930 re #3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Susan M. Davies, #4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Thomas J. Tobin, #2 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Michael F. Williams, #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Paul Suitter (fad, )
December 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX014929 re #1 Complaint, (fad, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Notice filed by Katrina Schaller re #1 Complaint, Notice of Constitutional Challenge to Statute by Katrina Schaller. (Jacob, Rodney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Paul Suitter (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) filed by Katrina Schaller. (Jacob, Rodney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Thomas J. Tobin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) filed by Katrina Schaller. (Jacob, Rodney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Susan M. Davies (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) filed by Katrina Schaller. (Jacob, Rodney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Michael F. Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) filed by Katrina Schaller. (Jacob, Rodney)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number Payment Due.), filed by Katrina Schaller. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 1/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet Civil)(Jacob, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaller v. U.S. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Schaller
Represented By: Rodney J. Jacob
Represented By: Paul Suitter
Represented By: Michael F. Williams
Represented By: Susan M. Davies
Represented By: Thomas Tobin
Represented By: Paul E. Suitter
Represented By: Thomas J. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Mikel W. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mikel W. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?