Kato v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susanna Kato
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00045
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Request to Reschedule the Scheduling Conference. Answer due 2/22/2019. Scheduling Conference continued to 3/26/2019 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 2/15/2019. (fad, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Request to Reschedule the Scheduling Conference, Certificate of Service by All Defendants. (Diaz, Geraldine)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United Airlines, Inc. Answer due 2/15/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 1/31/2019. (fad, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, Certificate of Service filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Camacho, Vincent)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 3/7/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Eileen C. Zorc for United Airlines, Inc. admitted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 1/28/2019. (fad, )
January 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number GUX015063 re #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Eileen C. Zorc (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) (fad, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration and Consent of Co-Counsel re #5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Eileen C. Zorc (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) , Certificate of Service by United Airlines, Inc.. (Diaz, Geraldine)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Eileen C. Zorc (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number Payment Due) filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Diaz, Geraldine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Attorney Appearance , Certificate of Service by All Defendants. (Camacho, Vincent)
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to United Airlines, Inc.. (fad, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Original Cover Sheet, filed by Susanna Kato.(fad, )
December 21, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX014972 re #1 Complaint (fad, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number Payment Due.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bell, John Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kato v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen C. Zorc
Represented By: Geraldine E. Diaz
Represented By: Vincent Cristobal Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanna Kato
Represented By: John Richard Bordallo Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?