Meno vs. Government of Guam, et al.
Plaintiff: Brianna Lynn Meno
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, Department of Corrections, Government Of Guam, Tony Lamorena, Alan P. Borja and Samantha J. Brennan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling and Planning Report . (Rudolph, Gloria)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order. The court continues the scheduling conference to July 16, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. The parties are directed to meet and confer for the purpose of formulating a Scheduling and Planning Conference Report which shall be filed with the court no later than July 11, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order or the federal and local rules may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 7/5/2019. (fad, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Reply to Response re #9 Opposition Reply Memorandum Regarding Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Government Of Guam. (Highsmith, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Opposition re #7 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brianna Lynn Meno. (Lujan, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 6/24/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 10:15 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Alan P. Borja, Samantha J. Brennan. (Highsmith, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance filed by David J. Highsmith on behalf of Alan P. Borja, Samantha J. Brennan (Highsmith, David)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by Brianna Lynn Meno. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 6/17/2019.(Lujan, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Department of Corrections, Government Of Guam. (Highsmith, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Entry of Appearance filed by David J. Highsmith on behalf of Department of Corrections, Government Of Guam (Highsmith, David)
April 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Government Of Guam, Tony Lamorena. (fad, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
March 28, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015233 re #1 Complaint (fad, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Lujan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meno vs. Government of Guam, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: David J. Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Of Guam
Represented By: David J. Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Lamorena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan P. Borja
Represented By: David J. Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha J. Brennan
Represented By: David J. Highsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Lynn Meno
Represented By: David J. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?