Braley v. Department of the Navy, United States of America, et al.
Plaintiff: David Braley
Defendant: John Doe Insurance Carrier to be Named After Discovery, Does 1-10, Inclusive and Department of the Navy, United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Department of the Navy, United States of America answer due 7/31/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 7/1/2019. (fad, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/1/2019) (fad, ). **Modified on 7/1/2019 to attach correct pdf** (fad, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, filed by Department of the Navy, United States of America. (Wessling, Jessica)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 8/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
April 28, 2019 Judge Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr added to case. (fad, )
April 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States of America(fad, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
April 26, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX015322 re #1 Complaint (fad, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages for Negligence Pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act; Premises Liability (Negligence); Certificate of Service against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number Payment Due.) Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Diaz, Geraldine) **Modified on 4/28/2019 to edit docket text and add missing defendants to docket** (fad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braley v. Department of the Navy, United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Insurance Carrier to be Named After Discovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy, United States of America
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Braley
Represented By: Geraldine E. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?