A.P.P. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al
Plaintiff: A.P.P.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District, Boy Scouts of America, Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea, DOE Entities 1-5, Capuchin Franciscans, DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive, Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana and Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Record from the Superior Court of Guam (fad, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Writ of Certiorari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 5/22/2019. (fad, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Notice of Removal filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana Amended Notice of Removal from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV0445-18. (Terlaje, John) **Modified on 6/3/2019** (fad, ).
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV0445-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-476850), filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Case)(Terlaje, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.P.P. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana
Represented By: John Coulter Terlaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.P.
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?