Habeck v. Ojets USA LLC
Plaintiff: Terry Habeck
Defendant: Ojets USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00099
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 8/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan Jr.. (fad, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Terry Habeck. Terry Habeck served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Berman, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ojets USA LLC. (fad, )
May 29, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015418 re #2 Complaint, (fad, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint against Ojets USA, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by Terry Habeck. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Michael) **Modified on 5/31/2019 to edit docket text**(fad, ).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Cover Sheet, filed by Terry Habeck.(Berman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habeck v. Ojets USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ojets USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Habeck
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?