BBB v. Mannetta et al
Plaintiff: BBB
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea, Andrew Mannetta, Capuchin Franciscans Province of St. Mary, DOE INDIVIDUALS 6-47, INCLUSIVE, Capuchin Franciscans, DOE Entities 1-5 and Doe-Individuals 6-47, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2019cv00104
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by BBB. Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (fad, )
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea. (vtk)
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Capuchin Franciscans Province of St. Mary. (vtk)
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Capuchin Franciscans. (vtk)
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Andrew Mannetta. (vtk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk)
June 11, 2019 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number GUX015466 re #1 Complaint. (vtk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by BBB.(Lujan, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PAYMENTDUE.), filed by BBB. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 7/22/2019.(Lujan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBB v. Mannetta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mannetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Province of St. Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE INDIVIDUALS 6-47, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe-Individuals 6-47, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBB
Represented By: David J. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?