I.V. v. Capuchin Franciscans et al
Plaintiff: I.V.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District, Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea, Boy Scouts of America, Capuchin Franciscans, DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive, DOE Entities 1-5 and Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary
Case Number: 1:2019cv00119
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo: Joint Status Hearing held on 8/16/2019. Parties' request for continuation of "Settlement Stay" is granted. Stay extended to September 27, 2019. Joint Status Hearing set for: September 27, 2019 at 8:30 AM.(Court Reporter Veronica Flores.) (fad, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure of Plaintiff's Name and Place of Residence filed by I.V. (fad, ) (fad, ).
July 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to Boy Scouts of America, Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District, Capuchin Franciscans, Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea, Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary. (fad, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
July 24, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015588 re #1 Complaint, (fad, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by I.V..(Berman, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by I.V.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.V. v. Capuchin Franciscans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capuchin Franciscans, Province of St. Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.V.
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?