TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. v. Birn et al
Plaintiff: TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Edward Birn and John Q. Lizama
Case Number: 1:2019cv00126
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Joseph Husslein re #19 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (fad, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 7, #2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 7, #3 Exhibit A Part 3 of 7, #4 Exhibit A Part 4 of 7, #5 Exhibit A Part 5 of 7, #6 Exhibit A Part 6 of 7, #7 Exhibit A Part 7 of 7), #8 Exhibit B Part 1 of 10, #9 Exhibit B Part 2 of 10, #10 Exhibit B Part 3 of 10, #11 Exhibit B Part 4 of 10, #12 Exhibit B Part 5 of 10, #13 Exhibit B Part 6 of 10, #14 Exhibit B Part 7 of 10, #15 Exhibit B Part 8 of 10, #16 Exhibit B Part 9 of 10, #17 Exhibit B Part 10 of 10, #18 Exhibit C, #19 Exhibit D Part 1 of 7, #20 Exhibit D Part 2 of 7, #21 Exhibit D Part 3 of 7, #22 Exhibit D Part 4 of 7, #23 Exhibit D Part 5 of 7, #24 Exhibit D Part 6 of 7, #25 Exhibit D Part 7 of 7), #26 Exhibit E Part 1 of 4, #27 Exhibit E Part 2 of 4, #28 Exhibit E Part 3 of 4, #29 Exhibit E Part 4 of 4, #30 Exhibit F, #31 Exhibit G, #32 Exhibit H, #33 Exhibit I), #34 Exhibit J Part 1 of 2, #35 Exhibit J Part 2 of 2) **Modified on 10/9/2019 to attach exhibits** (fad, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration of Louie J. Yanza re #19 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 4 of 4, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(fad, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 Concise Statement re #19 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yanza, Louie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yanza, Louie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #8 First Motion to Dismiss Failure to State a ClaimFirst Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yanza, Louie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1),(4)&(6) filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yanza, Louie)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Hearing. Status Hearing set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 10/2/2019. (vtk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Edward Birn, John Q. Lizama, TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. (fad, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Service by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yanza, Louie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (Yanza, Louie)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Motion(s) joined filed by John Q. Lizama : #9 Motion to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1),(4)&(6) filed by Edward Birn . (Baird, Kristina)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Appearance Entry of Appearance by Edward Birn. (Taitano, Shannon)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Motion(s) joined : #8 First Motion to Dismiss Failure to State a ClaimFirst Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Q. Lizama by Edward Birn. (Woloschuk, Marianne)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1),(4)&(6) filed by Edward Birn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Woloschuk, Marianne)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 First Motion to Dismiss Failure to State a Claim, First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Q. Lizama. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authority In Support of Defendant Lizama's Motion to Dismiss)(Baird, Kristina)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Service filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. re Summons and #1 Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Attorney's Fees served on Kristina L. Barid, Esq. (vtk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. re Summons and #1 Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Attorney's Fees served on the Office of the Attorney General. (vtk) **Modified on 8/29/2019 to edit docket text**
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. John Q. Lizama served via certified mail on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (vtk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. Edward Birn served via certified mail on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (vtk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure filed by TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.. (fad, )
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Edward Birn, John Q. Lizama. (fad, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
August 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015649 re #1 Verified Complaint (fad, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Attorney's Fees against TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Yanza, Louie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc. v. Birn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Birn
Represented By: Shannon Joy Taitano
Represented By: Marianne Woloschuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Q. Lizama
Represented By: Kristina L. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TakeCare Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louie J. Yanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?