Felder v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: Dominick Lamar Felder
Defendant: Mae M. Quitugua, Marceline U. Maratita, Cathy M. Cruz, Allen P. Borja, Samantha J. Brennan and Antone F. Aguon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00140
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Certified Mail No. 7013 2250 0002 0179 5545 sent to Dominick Lamar Felder, CO DOC, 101 Mashburn Lane, Mangilao, Guam 96910 re #16 Order returned as no such street. (vtk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 Response filed by Dominick Lamar Felder re #15 Answer to Complaint (fad, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. (fad, )
November 4, 2019 Court Certificate of Service re #16 Order. Dominick Lamar Felder served via certified mail no. 7103 2250 0002 0179 5545 at C/O Department of Corrections, 101 Mashburn Lane, Mangilao, Guam 96910 and certified mail no. 7013 2250 0002 0179 6511 at C/O Department of Corrections, PO Box 3236, Hagatna, Guam 96932. (vtk)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order. Should Plaintiff wish to file a motion for an OSC, Plaintiff shall include specific facts in an affidavit detailing wy an OSC should be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 11/4/2019. (vtk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Antone F. Aguon, Allen P. Borja, Samantha J. Brennan, Cathy M. Cruz, Marceline U. Maratita, Mae M. Quitugua.(Weinberg, Robert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Funds Prison Trust Account Information: #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Antone F. Aguon served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Executed filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Cathy M. Cruz served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Executed filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Mae M. Quitugua served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Samantha J. Brennan served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Allen P. Borja served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Marceline U. Maratita served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Certified mail no. 7017 1070 0000 5496 3158 sent to Samantha Brennan, Director, Department of Corrections at POB 3236, Hagatna, Guam 96932 re: #5 5 Order plus two blank copies of the Consent to Release of Trust Account Information returned as unclaimed. (fad, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Certified Mail No. 7017 1076 0000 5496 3172 sent to Samantha Brennan - Director, Department of Corrections CO DOC, 101 Mashburn Lane, Mangilao, Guam 96910 re: #5 Order plus two blank copies of the Consent to Release of Trust Account Information returned as undeliverable. (fad, )
October 4, 2019 Court Certificate of Service re #5 Order plus two blank copies of the Consent to Release of Trust Account Information - Samantha Brennan, Director, DOC, served on 10/4/2019 via certified mail no. 7017 1070 0000 5496 3172 at CO DOC, 101 Mashburn Lane, Mangilao, Guam 96910 and certified mail no. 7017 1070 0000 5496 3158 at CO POB 3236, Hagatna, Guam 96932. (fad, )
October 4, 2019 Court Certificate of Service re #5 Order plus two blank copies of the Consent to Release of Trust Account Information - Dominick Lamar Felder served on 10/4/2019 via certified mail no. 7017 1070 0000 5496 3141 at CO DOC, 101 Mashburn Lane, Mangilao, Guam 96910 and certified mail no. 7017 1070 0000 5496 3165 at CO POB 3236, Hagatna, Guam 96932. (fad, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order re #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. Certified Copy of Trust Account Information due within 30 days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 10/4/2019. (fad, )
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Cathy M. Cruz. (vtk)
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Allen P. Borja. (vtk)
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Marceline U. Maratita. (vtk)
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Antone F. Aguon. (vtk)
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Mae M. Quitugua. (vtk)
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Samantha J. Brennan. (vtk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. (fad, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. (fad, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants filed by Dominick Lamar Felder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits D-J)(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felder v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mae M. Quitugua
Represented By: Robert M. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marceline U. Maratita
Represented By: Robert M. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy M. Cruz
Represented By: Robert M. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen P. Borja
Represented By: Robert M. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha J. Brennan
Represented By: Robert M. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antone F. Aguon
Represented By: Robert M. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Lamar Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?