M.D. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: M.D.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District, Boy Scouts of America, DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive and DOE Entities 1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv00148
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Joaquin VE Manibusan
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Status Report by Boy Scouts of America, Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District. (Civille (non-CJA), G.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Status Report of Berman O'Connor & Mann on Sex Abuse Cases filed by M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Berman O'Connor & Mann Report)(Berman, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order. Status reports due by 1/6/2020. The court directs that the status reports be filed in table format, in substantially the same form as set forth in the attachments to this Order. Next Joint Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in 4th Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A and B) (vtk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency. Document due: Plaintiff's Disclosure of Name and Place of Residence to be filed over the counter and under seal. Document due by 3:00 p.m. Friday, November 22, 2019. (fad, )
November 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District. (vtk)
November 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Boy Scouts of America. (vtk)
November 18, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number GUX015918 re #1 Complaint. (vtk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by M.D..(Berman, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by M.D.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.D. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America Aloha Counsel Chamorro District
Represented By: G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Individuals 6-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D.
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?