Manibusan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Eileen B. Manibusan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00150
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Service (re #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint ) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Schwab, Mikel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Schwab, Mikel)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 2/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 09:00 AM (3/10/2020 4:00 p.m. PST) in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Senior Judge John C. Coughenour. (fad, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Mailng filed by Eileen B. Manibusan re Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, #1 Complaint (fad, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Eileen B. Manibusan. U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Guam served on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (fad, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Designation of U.S. Senior District Judge John Coughenour to perform the duties of District Judge temporarily in the District Court of Guam for this specific case. (White, Charles)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Of Recusal. Judge Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood recused.. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/18/2019. (fad, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Of Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 12/13/2019. (fad, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number GUX015985.), filed by Eileen B. Manibusan. (vtk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manibusan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Mikel W. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen B. Manibusan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?