Blastco Incorporated et al v. APTIM Federal Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Blastco Incorporated
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and APTIM Federal Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00019
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order granting #18 Unopposed Motion to Change Venue. Issued on 5/18/2020 by District Judge Alfred H. Bennett, Southern District of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (fad, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed Motion to Change Venue filed by APTIM Federal Services, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fad, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Resetting (fad, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting #15 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer APTIM Federal Services, LLC answer due 5/22/2020; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA answer due 5/22/2020.. Issued on 5/13/2020 by District Judge Alfred H. Bennett, Southern District of Texas (fad, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by APTIM Federal Services, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fad, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer APTIM Federal Services, LLC answer due 5/8/2020; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA answer due 5/8/2020.. Issued on 4/24/2020 by the Honorable Alfred H. Bennett, District Judge, Souther District of Texas (fad, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by APTIM Federal Services, LLC. (fad, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (fad, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by APTIM Federal Services, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fad, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed filed by Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware corporation), Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware Corporation in its own capacity). National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (fad, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware corporation), Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware Corporation in its own capacity) (fad, )
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting #6 Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daron Barsamian. Issued on 3/31/2020 (fad, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order granting #5 Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary A. Nye. Issued 3/30/2020 (fad, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daron Barsamian filed by Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware corporation), Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware Corporation in its own capacity). (fad, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary Nye filed by Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware corporation), Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware Corporation in its own capacity). (fad, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to APTIM Federal Services, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (fad, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to APTIM Federal Services, LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued to National Union)(fad, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties. Signed on 3/23/2020. (fad, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware corporation), Blastco Incorporated(a Delaware Corporation in its own capacity). Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit 4)(fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blastco Incorporated et al v. APTIM Federal Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blastco Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APTIM Federal Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?