Hauge v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Mercy N. Hauge individually and as a sole proprietor doing business as Island Breeze Mart
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00028
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 2023
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Returned Executed as to USA by United States of America. (Wessling, Jessica)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mercy N. Hauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Mark)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mercy N. Hauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Mark)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mercy N. Hauge. United States of America served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Mark)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulation Concerning Confidential Information filed by United States of America. (Wessling, Jessica)
October 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fad, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Complaint for De Novo Judicial Review against, filed by Mercy N. Hauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Mark)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mercy N. Hauge. United States of America served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (fad, ) **Modified on 9/23/2020 to correct filing date** (fad, ).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (Diaz, Francine)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for De Novo Judicial Review against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Mercy N Hauge. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Mark)
September 21, 2020 Civil Case Filing Fee. Receipt Number AGUDC-536943, Fee Amount $400.00. . (Smith, Mark)
September 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauge v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jessica F. Wessling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy N. Hauge individually and as a sole proprietor doing business as Island Breeze Mart
Represented By: Mark S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?