Beacon LLC v. Chiu
Plaintiff: Beacon LLC
Defendant: George Chiu and Does (1-10)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00043
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Beacon LLC. Beacon LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (Razzano, Joseph)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
November 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to George Chiu. (fad, )
November 24, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number GUX016717 re #1 Complaint, (fad, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by Beacon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Razzano, Joseph) **Modified on 11/24/2020 to edit docket text** (fad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacon LLC v. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beacon LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Razzano
Represented By: Braddock J. Huesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?