Allen v. Hyatt Regency Guam, et al.
Plaintiff: SCOTT ALLEN and ALEXANDER ALLEN
Defendant: NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH PENNSYLVANIA, HYATT REGENCY GUAM, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania and P.H.R. Micronesia, Inc. doing business as Hyatt Regency Guam Hotel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00008
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 Opposition re #14 Memorandum in Support, #13 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [F.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(1)] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Keogh, Robert)
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 4/15/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 09:15 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (fad, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 Declaration of Counsel re #13 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [F.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(1)] Declaration of R. Todd Thompson filed by All Defendants. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re: #13 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [F.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(1)] filed by All Defendants. (Thompson, Randall Todd) . filed by All Defendants. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [F.R.Civ.P. Rule 12(b)(1)] filed by All Defendants. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Scott Allen filed by Scott Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D)(Keogh, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration of Counsel filed by Robert Lees Keogh In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Keogh, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition re: #6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint [FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)] filed by Hyatt Regency Guam, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (Thompson, Randall Todd) . filed by All Plaintiffs. (Keogh, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Service of First Amended Complaint . (Keogh, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs.(Keogh, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re: #6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint [FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)] filed by Hyatt Regency Guam, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (Thompson, Randall Todd) . filed by Hyatt Regency Guam, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint [FRCP Rules 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6)] filed by Hyatt Regency Guam, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (Thompson, Randall Todd)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by Alexander Allen, Scott Allen. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (fad, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed filed by Alexander Allen, Scott Allen. Hyatt Regency Guam served on 1/19/2021, answer due 2/9/2021. (fad, )
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order granting #2 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem. Scott Allen is hereby appointed guardian ad litem for Alexander Allen. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 1/19/2021. (fad, )
January 19, 2021 Summons Issued as to Hyatt Regency Guam, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. (fad, )
January 15, 2021 Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo added to case. (vtk)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad litem ad Litem filed by All Plaintiffs. (Keogh, Robert)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against HYATT REGENCY GUAM, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH PENNSYLVANIA (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGUDC-550143.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Keogh, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Hyatt Regency Guam, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT ALLEN
Represented By: Robert Lees Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER ALLEN
Represented By: Robert Lees Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYATT REGENCY GUAM
Represented By: Randall Todd W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Randall Todd W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.H.R. Micronesia, Inc. doing business as Hyatt Regency Guam Hotel
Represented By: Randall Todd W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?