Marler v. Alutiiq Corporation et al
Plaintiff: JENNA MARLER
Defendant: EUGENE SAN NICOLAS SANTOS, Alfred Flores, Alutiiq Corporation and Alutiiq Corporation doing business as Alutiiq Logistics & Maintenance Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv00011
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 9:30 a.m. rescheduled to 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (NOTE: TIME CHANGE ONLY) (fad, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 5/25/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (fad, )
March 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Alfred Flores. (hpg)
March 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Eugene San Nicolas Santos. (hpg)
March 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Alutiiq Corporation. (hpg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Alutiiq Corporation, Eugene Santos and Alfred Flores (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGUDC-556258.), filed by Jenna Marler. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Holley, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2021: #2 Unredacted Complaint) **Modified on 3/17/2021 to attach redacted complaint** (vtk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marler v. Alutiiq Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE SAN NICOLAS SANTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alutiiq Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alutiiq Corporation doing business as Alutiiq Logistics & Maintenance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNA MARLER
Represented By: Matthew Jay Holley
Represented By: Victorino DLG Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?