Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. v. Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.
Defendant: Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00005
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Guam
Presiding Judge: Michael J Bordallo
Referring Judge: Frances M Tydingco-Gatewood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 Scheduling Notice. Scheduling and Planning Conference Report due by 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 09:00 AM in 3rd floor courtroom VTC before US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo. (fad, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Todd R. Kinnear admitted for Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 4/7/2022. (fad, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting #2 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Michael J. Perez admitted for Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Michael J. Bordallo on 4/7/2022. (fad, )
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, )
March 11, 2022 Summons Issued as to Johnson Outdoors, Inc.. (fad, )
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Todd R. Kinnear(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-603480) filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.. (Cook, Jeffrey) **Modified on 3/10/2022 to correct name of pro hac vice counsel** (fad, ).
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 Petition to Admit Attorney Pro Hac Vice - Michael J.. Perez (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGUDC-603475) filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.. (Cook, Jeffrey) **Modified on 3/10/2022 to correct Pro Hac Vice Counsel Name** (fad, ).
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages against Johnson Outdoors, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGUDC-603471.), filed by Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Cook, Jeffrey) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/10/2022) (fad, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2022) (fad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Guam District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc. v. Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axe Murderer Tours Guam, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Cook
Represented By: Todd R Kinnear
Represented By: Michael J Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Outdoors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?